WA SB5375 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a study of the differences in low-income housing development in urban and rural locations.
Title
Concerning a study of the differences in low-income housing development in urban and rural locations.
Sponsors
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Sen. Jeff Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Housing & Local Government (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Housing & Local Government. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | HLG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
Subjects
COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT
HOMES AND HOUSING
LEGISLATIVE AUDIT AND REVIEW COMMITTEE, JOINT (JLARC)
LOW-INCOME PERSONS
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
STUDIES
HOMES AND HOUSING
LEGISLATIVE AUDIT AND REVIEW COMMITTEE, JOINT (JLARC)
LOW-INCOME PERSONS
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
STUDIES