WA SB5375 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adding questions about wood burning appliances to the seller's disclosure statement for residential real property transfers.
Title
Adding questions about wood burning appliances to the seller's disclosure statement for residential real property transfers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-02-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-18 | FIHI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-10 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-21 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1577 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.