WA SB5370 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Updating mental health advance directive laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Updating mental health advance directive laws.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12SenateEffective date 7/25/2021*.
2021-05-12SenateChapter 287, 2021 Laws.
2021-05-12SenateGovernor signed.
2021-04-26SenateDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-20SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-15SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 1; excused, 0.
2021-04-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2021-04-08HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-08HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-08HouseFloor amendment
2021-04-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-03-25HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-03-24HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-03-24HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-24HouseCRJ - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-24HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2021-03-23HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2021-03-16HouseReferred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
2021-03-16HouseCommittee relieved of further consideration.
2021-03-10HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2021-03-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-03-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-08SenateFloor amendment
2021-03-08Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2021-03-03SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-15SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-12SenateBH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-12SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM.
2021-02-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM.
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care.
2021-02-03SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-28SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7132010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7132020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7132030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7132040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7132050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7132060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7132070Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7132100Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7132110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7132130Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7132140Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
7132170Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7132180Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7132210Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7132220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7132250Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7132260Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
7134755Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5370&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5370.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5370-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5370-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5370-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5370-S.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5370-S%20AMS%20DHIN%20S1835.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/5370-S.E%20AMH%20GILY%20LEIN%20246.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/5370-S.E%20AMH%20RULE%20LEIN%20249.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5370%20SBA%20BH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5370%20SBR%20BH%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5370%20SBR%20BH%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5370-S.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5370-S.E%20HBA%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5370-S.E%20HBR%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5370-S.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5370-S.E%20SBR%20HA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5370-S.E%20SBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124127&actionText=BH%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28594&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124127&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-08-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5370&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124127&actionText=CRJ%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28912&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124127&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-08-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5370&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124127&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-15-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5370&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback