WA SB5367 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the purple star award for military friendly schools.
Title
Creating the purple star award for military friendly schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-04-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-01 | House | ED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 12:05 PM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:30 AM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |