WA SB5361 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 5/12/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 5/12/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the resentencing of persons convicted of drug offenses.
Title
Concerning the resentencing of persons convicted of drug offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Effective date 5/12/2021. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Chapter 286, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-26 | House | PS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |