WA SB5358 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning affordable housing development on religious organization property.
Title
Concerning affordable housing development on religious organization property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | HSA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | And refer to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1377 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.