WA SB5357 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing cities and counties to impose additional taxes for affordable housing.
Title
Authorizing cities and counties to impose additional taxes for affordable housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | HSA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 5:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1493 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.