WA SB5355 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Mandating instruction on sex trafficking prevention and identification for students in grades seven through 12.
Title
Mandating instruction on sex trafficking prevention and identification for students in grades seven through 12.
Sponsors
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Education (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Education (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Chapter 328, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2023-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-10 | House | Committee amendment |
2023-04-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-04-04 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-04-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-04-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-03-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-28 | House | ED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-27 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-02 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 300 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28a | 320 | New Code | See Bill Text |