WA SB5352 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing new government employees the option of opting out of retirement system membership if the employee is age sixty or older when first hired, or when the employee's employer opts into retirement plan participation.
Title
Allowing new government employees the option of opting out of retirement system membership if the employee is age sixty or older when first hired, or when the employee's employer opts into retirement plan participation.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Perry Dozier [R] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Jeff Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-03-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-03-11 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 32 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 35 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 40 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |