WA SB5351 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
Pending: Senate Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
Pending: Senate Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning juvenile sex offense registration waivers under the special sexual offender disposition alternative.
Title
Concerning juvenile sex offense registration waivers under the special sexual offender disposition alternative.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |