WA SB5348 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-25 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-25 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Removing references to mitigation banking project eligibility for moneys in the habitat conservation account and the riparian protection account.
Title
Removing references to mitigation banking project eligibility for moneys in the habitat conservation account and the riparian protection account.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] | Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Ken Jacobsen [D] | Sen. Phillips Rockefeller [D] |
Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-25 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-03-25 | Chapter 16, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-03-25 | Governor signed. | |
2009-03-19 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-03-19 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-03-16 | President signed. | |
2009-03-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2009-03-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-09 | CB - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-09 | CB - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-09 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-04 | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. | |
2009-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-06 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-06 | NROR - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-05 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-04 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-20 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources, Ocean & Recreation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1846 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.