WA SB5342 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the distribution of monetary penalties to local courts and state agencies paid for failure to comply with discover pass requirements.
Title
Concerning the distribution of monetary penalties to local courts and state agencies paid for failure to comply with discover pass requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-10 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 11:00 AM. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | NRP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1478 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.