WA SB5341 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-25 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing permissible uses of existing local sales tax authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing permissible uses of existing local sales tax authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-25HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2021-03-25HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-24HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.
2021-02-18SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-18SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-12SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-10SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-09SenateHLG - Majority; do pass.
2021-02-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-02SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-25SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing & Local Government.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8214450Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5341&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5341.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5341%20SBA%20HLG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5341%20SBR%20HLG%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5341%20SBR%20HLG%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5341%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5341%20HBA%20FIN%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124029&actionText=HLG%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28588&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124029&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-18-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5341&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback