WA SB5341 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Improving access and completion for students at public institutions of higher education, especially at community and technical colleges, by removing restrictions on subsidized child care.
Title
Improving access and completion for students at public institutions of higher education, especially at community and technical colleges, by removing restrictions on subsidized child care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |