WA SB5341 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - On motion, referred to Labor & Commerce.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - On motion, referred to Labor & Commerce.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying monetary penalties imposed for infractions relating to mobile and manufactured home installation.
Title
Modifying monetary penalties imposed for infractions relating to mobile and manufactured home installation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | On motion, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | CLS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1329 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-14 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5341&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5341.pdf |