WA SB5340 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning qualifications for school board directors.
Title
Concerning qualifications for school board directors.
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 343 | 340 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 24 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 24 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |