WA SB5339 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Providing free school meals for all.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing free school meals for all.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-02-01SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2023-01-30SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2023-01-30SenateMinority; do not pass.
2023-01-30SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2023-01-30SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-01-30SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-12SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Same As/Similar To

HB1238 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023*.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28a150200Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28a150260Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28a235New CodeSee Bill Text
28a235140Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
28a235160Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
28a235250Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28a235260Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
28a235270Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28a235285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28a405415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28a600290Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28a600310Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5339&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5339.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5339-S.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5339%20SBA%20EDU%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5339%20SBR%20EDU%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5339%20SBR%20EDU%20OC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66138
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67408
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127809&actionText=EDU%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30599&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback