WA SB5339 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing criminal justice expenses by eliminating the death penalty and instead requiring life imprisonment without possibility of release or parole as the sentence for aggravated first degree murder.
Title
Reducing criminal justice expenses by eliminating the death penalty and instead requiring life imprisonment without possibility of release or parole as the sentence for aggravated first degree murder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2020-01-31 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-04-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-01 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1488 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.