WA SB5338 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning fire protection districts and education.
Title
Concerning fire protection districts and education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Chapter 19, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-03-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-03-24 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-24 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-12 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | HLG - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |