WA SB5334 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Washington uniform common interest ownership act.
Title
Concerning the Washington uniform common interest ownership act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Chapter 238, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on third reading. |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-03-29 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-22 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1306 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.