WA SB5331 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an early childhood court program for young children and their families involved or at risk of becoming involved in Washington's child welfare system.
Title
Establishing an early childhood court program for young children and their families involved or at risk of becoming involved in Washington's child welfare system.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Gildon [R] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Chapter 285, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-11 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-04-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2021-04-01 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-22 | House | CYF - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-17 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-27 | House | First reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE COURTS
CHILDREN
CHILDREN, YOUTH, AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT
COURTS
DOMESTIC RELATIONS
JUVENILES AND JUVENILE COURT
PUBLIC ASSISTANCE
CHILDREN
CHILDREN, YOUTH, AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT
COURTS
DOMESTIC RELATIONS
JUVENILES AND JUVENILE COURT
PUBLIC ASSISTANCE