WA SB5328 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a school-grading program that relies on the accountability index.
Title
Creating a school-grading program that relies on the accountability index.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] |
Sen. Michael Baumgartner [R] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Andy Hill [R] | Sen. John Braun [R] |
Sen. Rodney Tom [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2013-03-06 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |