WA SB5325 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the authority of a nurse working in a school setting.
Title
Clarifying the authority of a nurse working in a school setting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-28 | House | ED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1346 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2017.