WA SB5321 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 5/12/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 5/12/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding access to the college bound scholarship.
Title
Expanding access to the college bound scholarship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by College & Workforce Development (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage on Reconsideration (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Higher Education & Workforce Development (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by College & Workforce Development (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage on Reconsideration (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Higher Education & Workforce Development (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Effective date 5/12/2021. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Chapter 283, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 60; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-22 | House | House receded from amendments. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2021-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2021-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-01 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-24 | House | CWD - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Vote on third reading will be reconsidered. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 17; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28b | 118 | 010 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 118 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 118 | 090 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |