WA SB5320 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring notification to parents or guardians in cases of abortion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring notification to parents or guardians in cases of abortion.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-03-17SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2017-03-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-22SenateOn motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-02-09SenateHeld at the Desk.
2017-02-08SenateMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-08SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2017-02-08SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2017-01-20SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback