WA SB5318 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 6/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 6/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning fertilizer fees.
Title
Concerning fertilizer fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Effective date 6/1/2021. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Chapter 282, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 31; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-21 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-21 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-21 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-04-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-26 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 54 | 275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 54 | 325 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 54 | 350 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 54 | 362 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |