WA SB5318 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Reforming the compliance and enforcement provisions for marijuana licensees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reforming the compliance and enforcement provisions for marijuana licensees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-13SenateChapter 394, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-13SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-26SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-23SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 43; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-23SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-16HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-16HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-16HouseCommittee amendment
2019-04-16HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2019-04-11HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-26HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-26HouseCOG - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming.
2019-03-11SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-03-11SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-11SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-11Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-01SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-01SenateWM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Labor & Commerce.
2019-03-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM.
2019-02-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-20SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-20SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 5:45 PM.
2019-02-19SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-14SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Same As/Similar To

HB1237 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5318&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5318.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5318-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5318-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5318-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5318-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117844&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-11-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5318&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117844&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-16-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5318&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117844&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-23-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5318&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback