WA SB5317 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning nonfirearm measures to increase school safety and student well-being.
Title
Concerning nonfirearm measures to increase school safety and student well-being.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1216 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.