WA SB5317 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying terms for workforce and economic development.
Title
Clarifying terms for workforce and economic development.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerome Delvin [R] | Sen. Ken Jacobsen [D] | Sen. Fred Jarrett [D] | Sen. James Kastama [D] |
Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-18 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | Made eligible to be placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-24 | HE - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-24 | HE - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-24 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-11 | First reading, referred to Higher Education. | |
2009-03-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-03-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-09 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-17 | HEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-13 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-03 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-20 | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1395 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-06 - Effective date 7/26/2009.