WA SB5315 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning home site leases on lands managed by the department of natural resources.
Title
Concerning home site leases on lands managed by the department of natural resources.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Michael Baumgartner [R] | Sen. Brad Hawkins [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-29 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-16 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-22 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | NRP - Majority; do pass. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |