WA SB5315 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Effective date 10/9/2015*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Effective date 10/9/2015*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Aligning functions of the consolidated technology services agency, office of the chief information officer, and department of enterprise services.
Title
Aligning functions of the consolidated technology services agency, office of the chief information officer, and department of enterprise services.
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. John McCoy [D] | Sen. Kirk Pearson [R] |
Sen. Donald Benton [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | Effective date 10/9/2015*. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 1, 2015 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-29 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 2. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Placed on third reading. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2015-04-07 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-03 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:00 PM. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | GOSS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & State Security. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1391 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.