WA SB5312 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Facilitating transit-oriented development and increasing housing inventory.
Title
Facilitating transit-oriented development and increasing housing inventory.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Environment & Energy (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Environment & Energy (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-31 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-19 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | HLG - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |