WA SB5312 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting certain employers from including any question on an application about an applicant's criminal record, inquiring either orally or in writing about an applicant's criminal records, or obtaining information from a criminal background check, until after the employer initially determines that the applicant is otherwise qualified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting certain employers from including any question on an application about an applicant's criminal record, inquiring either orally or in writing about an applicant's criminal records, or obtaining information from a criminal background check, until after the employer initially determines that the applicant is otherwise qualified.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-23SenatePlaced on Rules White Sheet.
2017-04-23HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-04-14HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2017-04-06HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-04-04HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-04-04HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2017-04-04HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-04-04HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2017-04-04HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM.
2017-04-03HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2017-04-01HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2017-03-29HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2017-03-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-03-28HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2017-03-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-03-28HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2017-03-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-21HousePublic hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards
2017-03-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-03-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-07SenateFloor amendment
2017-03-07Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-06SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-02-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2017-02-01SenateCLS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-01SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback