WA SB5310 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/1/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/1/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Correcting agency names and accounts in statutes to reflect the organizational structure, duties, and responsibilities of the office of financial management.
Title
Correcting agency names and accounts in statutes to reflect the organizational structure, duties, and responsibilities of the office of financial management.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2019*. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Chapter 146, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-06 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-26 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1294 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.