WA SB5310 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing retired teachers working as coaches.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing retired teachers working as coaches.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2018-02-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations
2018-02-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-12Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-31SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-31SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-31SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-31SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-25SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-24SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-01-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback