WA SB5307 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creating alternatives to total confinement for certain qualifying offenders with minor children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating alternatives to total confinement for certain qualifying offenders with minor children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2018-02-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-26HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-26HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM.
2018-02-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-02-22HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-22HousePS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-20HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety
2018-02-09SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-09SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-09SenateFloor amendment
2018-02-09Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-31SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-31SenateHSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-31SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Human Services & Corrections.
2018-01-11SenateAnd refer to Human Services & Corrections.
2018-01-11SenateLAW - Majority; without recommendation.
2018-01-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-02-01SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback