WA SB5307 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning deficit reimbursement agreements with counties owning and operating ferry systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning deficit reimbursement agreements with counties owning and operating ferry systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-11SenateEffective date 7/24/2015.
2015-05-11SenateChapter 230, 2015 Laws.
2015-05-11SenateGovernor signed.
2015-04-23SenateDelivered to Governor.
2015-04-22HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-04-21SenatePresident signed.
2015-04-16SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 43; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2015-04-16SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2015-04-15HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 31; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2015-04-15HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2015-04-15HouseCommittee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
2015-04-13HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2015-03-23HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2015-03-19HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2015-03-19HouseMinority; do not pass.
2015-03-19HouseTR - Majority; do pass with amendment
2015-03-19HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2015-03-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2015-03-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation
2015-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2015-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2015-03-03SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2015-02-26SenateMade eligible to be placed on second reading.
2015-02-04SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2015-02-02SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass.
2015-02-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2015-01-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2015-01-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB1318 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback