WA SB5307 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the definition of unlawful detainer to include a provision governing at-will tenancies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding the definition of unlawful detainer to include a provision governing at-will tenancies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2013-05-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2013-02-07SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM.
2013-01-25SenateFirst reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance.

Same As/Similar To

HB1532 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback