WA SB5306 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning local salmon habitat recovery planning in critical areas.
Title
Concerning local salmon habitat recovery planning in critical areas.
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 70a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 70a | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 130 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |