WA SB5305 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the office of career connect Washington.
Title
Establishing the office of career connect Washington.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1374 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28b | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
28b | 77 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28c | 30 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28c | 30 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28c | 30 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28c | 30 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28c | 30 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28c | 30 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |