WA SB5303 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting United States food and drug administration nonpublic information from disclosure under the state public disclosure act.
Title
Exempting United States food and drug administration nonpublic information from disclosure under the state public disclosure act.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 99, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-15 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-15 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:15 AM. |
2021-02-25 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |