WA SB5302 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Granting half-time service credit for half-time educational employment prior to January 1, 1987, in plans 2 and 3 of the school employees' retirement system and the public employees' retirement system.
Title
Granting half-time service credit for half-time educational employment prior to January 1, 1987, in plans 2 and 3 of the school employees' retirement system and the public employees' retirement system.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fraser [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Janea Holmquist [R] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] |
Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-11 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-08 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-02 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-20 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1541 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-18 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5302&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5302.pdf |