WA SB5301 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Including repeat and willful violations of certain state laws to the state's responsible bidder criteria.
Title
Including repeat and willful violations of certain state laws to the state's responsible bidder criteria.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Miloscia [R] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] |
Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Chapter 258, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-30 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-30 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:30 AM. |
2017-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. |
2017-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government. |