WA SB5298 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding labeling of marijuana products.
Title
Regarding labeling of marijuana products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2020. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 393, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 42; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee amendment |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-02 | House | COG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-13 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Held on second reading. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 5:45 PM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1250 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.