WA SB5297 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modernizing, harmonizing, and improving the efficacy and accessibility of laws concerning civil protection orders.
Title
Modernizing, harmonizing, and improving the efficacy and accessibility of laws concerning civil protection orders.
Sponsors
Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] |
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1320 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/1/2022*.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5297&Year=2021&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5297.pdf |