WA SB5295 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Transforming the regulation of gas and electrical companies toward multiyear rate plans and performance-based rate making.
Title
Transforming the regulation of gas and electrical companies toward multiyear rate plans and performance-based rate making.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Chapter 188, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 42; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-26 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1498 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
80 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
80 | 28 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 28 | 068 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |