WA SB5295 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning labor neutrality and contractor compliance for certain contracted service providers.
Title
Concerning labor neutrality and contractor compliance for certain contracted service providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-04-01 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing scheduled, but not heard in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |