WA SB5295 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing unanimous recommendations of the public records exemptions accountability committee.
Title
Implementing unanimous recommendations of the public records exemptions accountability committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Janea Holmquist [R] | Sen. Curtis King [R] |
Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. Eric Oemig [D] | Sen. Phillips Rockefeller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Chapter 128, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-19 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-09 | President signed. | |
2010-03-08 | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-08 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-28 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-19 | SGTA - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-19 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-19 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-04 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2010-02-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-11 | On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | SGTA - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-26 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-10 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2009-03-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 7. | |
2009-03-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-07 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-02-23 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-09 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-20 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |