WA SB5293 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing mental health sentencing alternatives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing mental health sentencing alternatives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-22SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-22SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM.
2021-02-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-12SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-02-11SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-02-11SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-02-08SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM.
2021-01-20SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
994aNew CodeSee Bill Text
994a501Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5293&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5293.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5293-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5293-S2.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5293%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5293%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5293%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5293%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5293%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5293%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123652&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28542&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123652&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28693&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback