WA SB5292 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing the access of certain aquatic lands by a public transportation benefit area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing the access of certain aquatic lands by a public transportation benefit area.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2024-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-04-23SenateBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2023-02-24HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2023-02-22SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2023-02-22SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-02-15SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2023-01-30SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2023-01-26SenateAWNP - Majority; do pass.
2023-01-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.

Same As/Similar To

HB1334 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2023.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3657aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5292&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5292.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5292%20SBA%20AWNP%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5292%20SBR%20AWNP%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5292%20SBR%20AWNP%20OC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5292%20SBR%20APS%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=65731
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127719&actionText=AWNP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=30424&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=127719&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-22-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5292&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback